Nebraska – Dawson – Cozad
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Nebraska
Dawson
Cozad
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
33234
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33234
FDIC's unique number: 46673
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Island
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1825817
Report Date: 1996-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-01-22
1990-11-30 Institution established. Original name: Nebraska State Bank.
1993-03-31 Acquired Bank Of Overton in Overton, Nebraska.
1997-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Security Bank, Sidney in Sidney, Nebraska.
1998-04-03 Acquired The Home Bank in Elwood, Nebraska.
1999-01-29 Acquired The Martell State Bank in Martell, Nebraska.
1999-10-01 Changed name to Security First Bank .
1999-10-01 Acquired Stockmens National Bank in Rushville, Nebraska.
2006-02-15 Moved bank headquarters from Sidney, Nebraska to Lincoln, Nebraska.
2008-09-05 Acquired The First National Bank & Trust Company Of Beatrice in Beatrice, Nebraska.
2010-02-02 Acquired The First National Bank Of Valentine in Valentine, Nebraska.
Total assets: $33,848,000
Total deposits: $24,939,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Nebraska State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Nebraska State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Nebraska State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26186