Pennsylvania – Clarion – New Bethlehem
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
Clarion
New Bethlehem
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11873
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 11873
FDIC's unique number: 7586
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 87926
Report Date: 1995-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-04-17
1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: New Bethlehem Bank.
1995-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PFC Bank in Ford City, Pennsylvania.
2002-09-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of S&T; Bank in Indiana, Pennsylvania.
2008-06-07 Acquired Irwin Bank in Irwin, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $130,703,000
Total deposits: $107,124,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
New Bethlehem Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with New Bethlehem Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and New Bethlehem Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6244