New England Bank and Trust Company

Connecticut – Hartford – Windsor

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20536

1971

FDIC Certificate Number: 20536
FDIC's unique number: 14173
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 709004
Report Date: 1999-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-02-02

1971-11-04 Institution established. Original name: New England Bank And Trust Company.
1988-06-27 Acquired Windsor Bank And Trust Company in Windsor, Connecticut.
1988-06-27 Moved bank headquarters from Enfield, Connecticut to Windsor, Connecticut.
1996-07-12 Acquired Manchester State Bank in Manchester, Connecticut.
1997-08-08 Acquired First Bank Of West Hartford in West Hartford, Connecticut.
1998-08-14 Acquired Bank Of South Windsor in South Windsor, Connecticut.
1998-11-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Webster Bank in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2000-06-23 Acquired Mechanics Savings Bank in Hartford, Connecticut.
2003-11-07 Acquired The North American Bank & Trust Company in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-04-21 Changed name to Webster Bank, National Association .
2004-04-21 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-04-21 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2004-04-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-04-21 Acquired Webster Trust Company, National Association in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-05-14 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of America in Fall River, Massachusetts.
2004-12-03 Acquired First City Bank in New Britain, Connecticut.
2005-02-28 Acquired State Bank Of Howards Grove in Howards Grove, Wisconsin.
2006-10-06 Acquired Newmil Bank in New Milford, Connecticut.

Total assets: $586,266,000
Total deposits: $431,237,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

New England Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with New England Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and New England Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13617

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.