Georgia – Coffee – Nicholls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Coffee
Nicholls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17167
1943
FDIC Certificate Number: 17167
FDIC's unique number: 11202
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 625038
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1943-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Nicholls State Bank.
1988-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southeastern Bank in Folkston, Georgia.
1990-07-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southeastern Bank in Darien, Georgia.
1996-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Folkston, Georgia to Darien, Georgia.
1997-05-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1998-06-26 Acquired Southeastern Bank Of Florida in Yulee, Florida.
Total assets: $19,049,000
Total deposits: $17,363,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Nicholls State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Nicholls State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Nicholls State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21179