Illinois – Putnam – Hennepin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ncb-ebanc.com
Illinois
Putnam
Hennepin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
17241
1946
FDIC Certificate Number: 17241
FDIC's unique number: 11268
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 565536
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1946-12-07 Institution established. Original name: Putnam County Bank.
1985-12-31 Reorganized.
1998-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Ladd in Ladd, Illinois.
1999-07-01 Changed name to North Central Bank .
Total assets: $127,759,000
Total deposits: $108,134,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $108,134,000
Equity capital: $14,656,000
Net income: $670,000
Return on Assets: 1.11
Return on Equity: 9.33
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Putnam County Bancorp, Inc.
North Central Bank - Ladd Branch
North Central Bank - North Central Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
North Central Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with North Central Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Central Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10107