Texas – Cooke – Gainesville
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Cooke
Gainesville
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
24428
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 24428
FDIC's unique number: 16987
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 251259
Report Date: 1996-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1996-07-23
1983-04-18 Institution established. Original name: North Texas Bank And Trust.
1996-07-01 Reorganized.
1996-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First State Bank of Gainesville in Gainesville, Texas.
2002-08-14 Changed name to First State Bank .
Total assets: $47,788,000
Total deposits: $44,452,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
North Texas Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with North Texas Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Texas Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8254