Iowa – Bremer – Sumner
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.northeastsecuritybank.com
Iowa
Bremer
Sumner
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
18384
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 18384
FDIC's unique number: 12292
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 442244
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-04-04
1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1984-04-02 Changed name to Northeast Iowa National Bank .
1985-08-01 Moved bank headquarters from Fredericksburg, Iowa to Sumner, Iowa.
1992-07-01 Changed name to Northeast Security Bank .
1992-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2008-04-01 Acquired Fairbank State Bank in Fairbank, Iowa.
Total assets: $114,411,000
Total deposits: $91,738,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $91,738,000
Equity capital: $12,368,000
Net income: $591,000
Return on Assets: 1.04
Return on Equity: 10.1
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Independence Bancshares, Inc.
Northeast Security Bank - Fairbank Branch
Northeast Security Bank - Fredericksburg Facility
Northeast Security Bank - Main Street Branch
Northeast Security Bank - Northeast Security Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Northeast Security Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Northeast Security Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northeast Security Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19163