Vermont – Washington – Northfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Vermont
Washington
Northfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14160
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 14160
FDIC's unique number: 8841
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 284903
Report Date: 1971-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Northfield Trust Company.
1971-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Merchants National Bank of Burlington in Burlington, Vermont.
1974-09-06 Changed name to The Merchants Bank .
1977-03-04 Acquired Hardwick Trust Company in Hardwick, Vermont.
1980-12-30 Acquired Catamount Bank in North Bennington, Vermont.
1985-04-01 Acquired Sterling Trust Company in Johnson, Vermont.
1993-06-04 Acquired New First National Bank Of Vermont, National Association in Bradford, Vermont.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Northfield Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Northfield Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northfield Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8005