New Hampshire – Rockingham – Portsmouth
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
4264
1854
FDIC Certificate Number: 4264
FDIC's unique number: 2797
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 252706
Report Date: 2008-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-19
1854-05-25 Institution established. Original name: The Ocean National Bank Of Kennebunk.
1985-02-01 Reorganized.
2001-09-01 Changed name to Ocean National Bank .
2002-04-10 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2004-05-28 Acquired Granite Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
2004-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Kennebunk, Maine to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2007-06-29 Changed name to Ocean Bank .
2007-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-11-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Company in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $2,208,891,000
Total deposits: $1,447,144,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Ocean Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Ocean Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ocean Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11716