Colorado – Montrose – Olathe
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
www.olathestatebank.com
Colorado
Montrose
Olathe
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
22324
1976
FDIC Certificate Number: 22324
FDIC's unique number: 15533
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 463351
Report Date: 2006-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2006-08-09
1976-08-30 Institution established. Original name: Olathe State Bank.
1998-10-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2006-06-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank, Independence, Kansas in Independence, Kansas.
Total assets: $64,838,000
Total deposits: $57,852,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Olathe State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Olathe State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Olathe State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22320