New Hampshire – Rockingham – Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26817
1986
FDIC Certificate Number: 26817
FDIC's unique number: 35997
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 407001
Report Date: 1999-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-02-01
1986-10-27 Institution established. Original name: Olde Port Bank And Trust.
1999-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Webster Bank in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2000-06-23 Acquired Mechanics Savings Bank in Hartford, Connecticut.
2003-11-07 Acquired The North American Bank & Trust Company in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-04-21 Changed name to Webster Bank, National Association .
2004-04-21 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-04-21 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2004-04-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-04-21 Acquired Webster Trust Company, National Association in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-05-14 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of America in Fall River, Massachusetts.
2004-12-03 Acquired First City Bank in New Britain, Connecticut.
2005-02-28 Acquired State Bank Of Howards Grove in Howards Grove, Wisconsin.
2006-10-06 Acquired Newmil Bank in New Milford, Connecticut.
Total assets: $59,912,000
Total deposits: $46,203,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Olde Port Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Olde Port Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Olde Port Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20810