Colorado – Jefferson – Arvada
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Jefferson
Arvada
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
21543
1974
FDIC Certificate Number: 21543
FDIC's unique number: 14904
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 876456
Report Date: 1994-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1994-11-07
1974-04-29 Institution established. Original name: Northwest State Bank.
1981-10-02 Changed name to Omnibank Arvada .
1994-01-01 Acquired Denver West Bank And Trust in Jefferson County, Colorado.
1994-08-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of OMNIBANK Southeast in Denver, Colorado.
1994-10-17 Acquired Omnibank Arapahoe in Englewood, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Colorado in Fort Collins, Colorado.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.
Total assets: $46,051,000
Total deposits: $42,107,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
OMNIBANK Arvada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with OMNIBANK Arvada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and OMNIBANK Arvada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6083