Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.onegeorgiabank.com
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
58238
2006
FDIC Certificate Number: 58238
FDIC's unique number: 444131
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3442704
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-18
2006-05-05 Institution established. Original name: One Georgia Bank.
2011-07-15 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Ameris Bank in Moultrie, Georgia.
2011-07-15 FDIC closing information for
One Georgia Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/onegeorgia.html.
Total assets: $177,715,000
Total deposits: $158,123,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $158,123,000
Equity capital: $-977,000
Net income: $-6,375,000
Return on Assets: -6.87
Return on Equity: -462.96
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
One Georgia Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with One Georgia Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and One Georgia Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13965