California – Alameda – Oakland
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.opcb.com
California
Alameda
Oakland
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
58490
2007
FDIC Certificate Number: 58490
FDIC's unique number: 453951
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3608751
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 718E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
2007-06-27 Institution established. Original name: Onecalifornia Bank, Fsb.
2010-12-22 Changed name to One Pacificcoast Bank, Fsb .
2010-12-31 Acquired Shorebank, Pacific in Ilwaco, Washington.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $279,687,000
Total deposits: $218,350,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $218,350,000
Equity capital: $32,685,000
Net income: $-474,000
Return on Assets: -0.33
Return on Equity: -2.9
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
One Pacificcoast Bank, Fsb - Mosler Branch
One Pacificcoast Bank, Fsb - One Pacificcoast Bank, Fsb
One Pacificcoast Bank, Fsb - Shorebank, Pacific Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
One PacificCoast Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with One PacificCoast Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and One PacificCoast Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16747