Oklahoma – Osage – Pawhuska
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.osagefed.com
Oklahoma
Osage
Pawhuska
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
28356
1918
FDIC Certificate Number: 28356
FDIC's unique number: 41190
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 80776
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 701E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1918-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Osage Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1988-04-30 Changed name to Osage Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Paw Huska .
2004-03-31 Changed name to Osage Federal Bank .
2004-03-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
2008-04-02 Acquired Barnsdall State Bank in Barnsdall, Oklahoma.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $155,184,000
Total deposits: $115,795,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $115,795,000
Equity capital: $19,118,000
Net income: $417,000
Return on Assets: 0.54
Return on Equity: 4.14
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Osage Federal Bank - Barnsdall Branch
Osage Federal Bank - Bartlesville Branch
Osage Federal Bank - Osage Federal Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Osage Federal Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Osage Federal Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Osage Federal Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13902