Colorado – Delta – Paonia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Delta
Paonia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
22508
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 22508
FDIC's unique number: 15696
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 464956
Report Date: 2010-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-07-09
1977-08-15 Institution established. Original name: Paonia State Bank.
2010-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First State Bank of Colorado in Hotchkiss, Colorado.
Total assets: $49,209,000
Total deposits: $40,417,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Paonia State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Paonia State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Paonia State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23349