New Jersey – Gloucester – Sewell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.parkebank.com
New Jersey
Gloucester
Sewell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34888
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 34888
FDIC's unique number: 61951
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2764212
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-09-20
1999-01-28 Institution established. Original name: Parke Bank.
2006-07-17 Reorganized.
Total assets: $745,188,000
Total deposits: $602,215,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $602,215,000
Equity capital: $87,737,000
Net income: $4,654,000
Return on Assets: 1.25
Return on Equity: 10.86
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Parke Bancorp, Inc
Parke Bank - Galloway Branch
Parke Bank - Millville Loan Production Office
Parke Bank - Northfield Office Branch
Parke Bank - Parke Bank
Parke Bank - Spruce Street Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Parke Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Parke Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Parke Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18396