New Hampshire – Grafton – Littleton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Grafton
Littleton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
35133
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 35133
FDIC's unique number: 74922
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2848514
Report Date: 2001-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2002-01-15
1999-10-21 Institution established. Original name: Passumpsic Bank, Fsb.
2002-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Passumpsic Savings Bank in St. Johnsbury, Vermont.
2006-10-18 Acquired The Siwooganock Bank in Lancaster, New Hampshire.
2008-07-12 Acquired The Lancaster National Bank in Lancaster, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $14,657,000
Total deposits: $12,007,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Passumpsic Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Passumpsic Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Passumpsic Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8817