Louisiana – De Soto – Mansfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Louisiana
De Soto
Mansfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
9321
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 9321
FDIC's unique number: 5975
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 988050
Report Date: 1987-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Pelican State Bank.
1985-04-01 Moved bank headquarters from Pelican, Louisiana to Mansfield, Louisiana.
1987-06-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples State Bank in Many, Louisiana.
1991-05-17 Acquired Red River Federal Savings And Loan Association in Coushatta, Louisiana.
1997-06-20 Acquired First Bank Of Natchitoches And Trust Company in Natchitoches, Louisiana.
2005-12-06 Acquired First State Bank in Texarkana, Texas.
Total assets: $7,188,000
Total deposits: $7,026,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Pelican State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Pelican State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pelican State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1578