Indiana – Ripley – Versailles
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Indiana
Ripley
Versailles
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8048
1891
FDIC Certificate Number: 8048
FDIC's unique number: 5121
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 719647
Report Date: 1989-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Versailles.
1978-09-30 Acquired The Cross Plains State Bank in Cross Plains, Indiana.
1988-10-21 Changed name to People's Trust Company .
1988-12-02 Reorganized.
1989-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's Trust Company in Arlington, Indiana.
1992-01-24 Moved bank headquarters from Versailles, Indiana to Brookville, Indiana.
1992-12-18 Acquired The Rushville National Bank in Rushville, Indiana.
2002-10-05 Changed name to Mainsource Bank .
2002-10-05 Moved bank headquarters from Brookville, Indiana to Greensburg, Indiana.
2002-10-05 Acquired Union Bank And Trust Company Of Indiana in Greensburg, Indiana.
2004-10-09 Acquired First Community Bank And Trust in Bargersville, Indiana.
2005-02-12 Acquired Regional Bank in New Albany, Indiana.
2005-08-26 Acquired The Madison Bank And Trust Company in Madison, Indiana.
2005-10-15 Acquired Peoples Trust Company in Linton, Indiana.
2007-09-15 Acquired Mainsource Bank - Crawfordsville in Crawfordsville, Indiana.
2008-11-15 Acquired 1st Independence Bank in Louisville, Kentucky.
2009-10-22 Acquired Mainsource Bank - Hobart in Hobart, Indiana.
2009-11-13 Acquired Mainsource Bank Of Illinois in Kankakee, Illinois.
2009-12-05 Acquired Mainsource Bank - Ohio in Troy, Ohio.
Total assets: $15,802,000
Total deposits: $14,518,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
People's Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with People's Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and People's Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17645