New Hampshire – Grafton – Littleton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Grafton
Littleton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19624
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19624
FDIC's unique number: 13423
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 275602
Report Date: 2000-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-11-01
1966-08-29 Institution established. Original name: Peoples National Bank Of Littleton.
1991-10-01 Changed name to Peoples Bank Of Littleton .
1991-10-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2000-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Connecticut River Bank, National Association in Springfield, Vermont.
Total assets: $51,528,000
Total deposits: $45,763,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Peoples Bank of Littleton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Peoples Bank of Littleton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Peoples Bank of Littleton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12483