Iowa – Pottawattamie – Council Bluffs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.peoplesnb.com
Iowa
Pottawattamie
Council Bluffs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
22712
1978
FDIC Certificate Number: 22712
FDIC's unique number: 15854
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha
Federal Reserve ID Number: 182540
Report Date: 2004-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17128
The date of the last data update: 2005-03-04
1978-09-18 Institution established. Original name: First Bank And Trust Of Carter Lake.
1978-09-18 Changed trust powers to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1981-12-15 Changed name to First Bank, National Association .
1983-07-18 Moved bank headquarters from Omaha, Nebraska to Council Bluffs, Iowa.
1989-04-19 Changed name to Peoples National Bank .
1989-12-31 Acquired Peoples State Bank in Missouri Valley, Iowa.
2005-02-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American National Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.
Total assets: $369,733,000
Total deposits: $302,959,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Peoples National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Peoples National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Peoples National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18874