Wyoming
Park
Cody
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
22860
1979
FDIC Certificate Number: 22860
FDIC's unique number: 15974
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 887751
Report Date: 2000-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2000-11-02
1979-05-14 Institution established. Original name: Western Bank Of Cody.
1998-06-20 Acquired First National Bank in Worland, Wyoming.
1998-06-20 Changed name to Pinnacle Bank .
2000-10-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pinnacle Bank - Wyoming in Torrington, Wyoming.
2004-09-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2004-09-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $139,831,000
Total deposits: $124,327,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Pinnacle Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Pinnacle Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pinnacle Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17144