Hawaii – Honolulu – Honolulu
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Hawaii
Honolulu
Honolulu
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30131
1890
FDIC Certificate Number: 30131
FDIC's unique number: 42965
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco
Federal Reserve ID Number: 671277
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1997-05-12
1890-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Pioneer Federal Savings Bank.
1997-04-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Hawaiian Bank in Honolulu, Hawaii.
1998-06-19 Acquired First Hawaiian Creditcorp, Inc. in Honolulu, Hawaii.
2000-04-14 Acquired Standard Financial Corp. in Honolulu, Hawaii.
2004-03-08 Reorganized.
2004-04-30 Reorganized.
Total assets: $767,726,000
Total deposits: $384,596,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Pioneer Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Pioneer Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pioneer Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2768