www.piscataqua.com
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
17443
1877
FDIC Certificate Number: 17443
FDIC's unique number: 11435
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 591209
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1877-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Piscataqua Savings Bank.
1995-04-05 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $219,983,000
Total deposits: $182,587,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $182,587,000
Equity capital: $36,602,000
Net income: $675,000
Return on Assets: 0.61
Return on Equity: 3.73
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
Piscataqua Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Piscataqua Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Piscataqua Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18315