Minnesota – Dakota – Farmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.premierbanks.com
Minnesota
Dakota
Farmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
33204
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33204
FDIC's unique number: 46444
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1481745
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-11-26
1990-10-05 Institution established. Original name: Premier Bank Metro South.
2001-07-02 Changed name to Premier Bank Minnesota .
Total assets: $188,485,000
Total deposits: $173,200,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $173,200,000
Equity capital: $14,136,000
Net income: $457,000
Return on Assets: 0.47
Return on Equity: 6.62
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Premier Bank Minnesota - Albertville Branch
Premier Bank Minnesota - Bloomington Branch
Premier Bank Minnesota - Faribault Branch
Premier Bank Minnesota - Hastings Branch
Premier Bank Minnesota - Monticello Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Premier Bank Minnesota does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Premier Bank Minnesota, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Premier Bank Minnesota will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17446