Minnesota – Mille Lacs – Princeton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Mille Lacs
Princeton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1382
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 1382
FDIC's unique number: 906
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 731256
Report Date: 1999-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-10-27
1908-04-01 Institution established. Original name: Princeton State Bank.
1991-06-15 Acquired The Citizens State Bank Of Milaca-ogilvie in Milaca, Minnesota.
1991-06-15 Changed name to Princeton Bank .
1999-10-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bremer Bank, National Association in South St. Paul, Minnesota.
Total assets: $177,870,000
Total deposits: $147,213,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Princeton Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Princeton Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Princeton Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17212