New Hampshire – Strafford – Rochester
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.profilebank.com
New Hampshire
Strafford
Rochester
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
28155
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 28155
FDIC's unique number: 40989
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 672573
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 701E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Profile Bank, Fsb.
2008-09-16 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $158,980,000
Total deposits: $133,276,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $133,276,000
Equity capital: $22,270,000
Net income: $346,000
Return on Assets: 0.44
Return on Equity: 3.13
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Profile Bank, Fsb - Alton Branch
Profile Bank, Fsb - Meadow St Branch
Profile Bank, Fsb - Profile Bank, Fsb
Profile Bank, Fsb - Route 108 Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Profile Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Profile Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Profile Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27111