New Hampshire – Belknap – Tilton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.providian.com
New Hampshire
Belknap
Tilton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6252
1853
FDIC Certificate Number: 6252
FDIC's unique number: 4221
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 121709
Report Date: 2005-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1333
The date of the last data update: 2005-10-12
1853-03-12 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens' National Bank Of Tilton.
1982-03-01 Changed name to First Deposit National Bank .
1996-04-19 Changed organization type to Credit Card Bank.
1998-01-01 Acquired Providian National Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1998-01-01 Changed name to Providian National Bank .
2003-12-31 Acquired Providian Bank in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2005-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada.
2006-03-01 Reorganized.
2006-10-01 Acquired Commercial Capital Bank, Fsb in Irvine, California.
2008-09-25 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-09-25 FDIC closing information for
Washington Mutual Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/wamu.html.
Total assets: $13,097,674,000
Total deposits: $9,012,407,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Providian National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Providian National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Providian National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-646