New Hampshire – Merrimack – Concord
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Merrimack
Concord
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
33237
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33237
FDIC's unique number: 46676
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1836251
Report Date: 1997-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22028
The date of the last data update: 1998-01-13
1990-12-28 Institution established. Original name: First Deposit National Credit Card Bank.
1995-01-01 Changed name to Providian National Bank .
1998-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Providian National Bank in Tilton, New Hampshire.
2003-12-31 Acquired Providian Bank in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2005-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada.
2006-03-01 Reorganized.
2006-10-01 Acquired Commercial Capital Bank, Fsb in Irvine, California.
2008-09-25 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-09-25 FDIC closing information for
Washington Mutual Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/wamu.html.
Total assets: $565,784,000
Total deposits: $375,636,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Providian National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Providian National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Providian National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26189