Missouri – St. Louis (city) – Saint Louis
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Missouri
St. Louis (city)
Saint Louis
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30393
1914
FDIC Certificate Number: 30393
FDIC's unique number: 43227
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 269179
Report Date: 1998-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-21
1914-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Public Service Savings And Loan Association.
1990-11-02 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1990-11-21 Changed name to Public Service Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1990-11-21 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1998-06-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of South Side National Bank in St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
2001-10-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Allegiant Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2002-04-09 Moved bank headquarters from St. Louis, Missouri to Saint Louis, Missouri.
2002-05-10 Acquired The Bank Of St. Charles County in St. Charles, Missouri.
2002-10-25 Acquired State Bank Of Jefferson County in De Soto, Missouri.
2004-07-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank of the Midwest in Bannockburn, Illinois.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
Total assets: $70,956,000
Total deposits: $57,333,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Public Service Bank, a federal savings bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Public Service Bank, a federal savings bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Public Service Bank, a federal savings bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7682