Texas – Blanco – Johnson City
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Texas
Blanco
Johnson City
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32074
1980
FDIC Certificate Number: 32074
FDIC's unique number: 44908
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 403777
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01
1980-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Ranchers Savings Association.
1988-12-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas Trust Savings Bank FSB in Llano, Texas.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Johnson City, Texas to Austin, Texas.
1993-10-22 Moved bank headquarters from Austin, Texas to Buchanan Dam, Texas.
1994-12-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $56,154,000
Total deposits: $93,256,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Ranchers Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Ranchers Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ranchers Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20916