Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.rbcbankusa.com
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
26342
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 26342
FDIC's unique number: 32882
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Pensacola
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3783948
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23416
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-10-05
1985-08-30 Institution established. Original name: First Bank Of Baldwin County.
1997-08-15 Changed name to Citizens And People's Bank, National Association .
1997-08-15 Moved bank headquarters from Robertsdale, Alabama to Cantonment, Florida.
1997-08-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-10-15 Changed name to Citizens & Peoples Bank, National Association .
1998-12-31 Acquired Community Bank Of Naples, National Association in Naples, Florida.
2002-09-27 Moved bank headquarters from Cantonment, Florida to Pensacola, Florida.
2005-03-18 Acquired First Gulf Bank in Gulf Shores, Alabama.
2005-03-18 Changed name to First Gulf Bank, National Association .
2009-08-27 Acquired Centura Card Bank in Norcross, Georgia.
2009-08-27 Changed name to Rbc Bank, National Association .
2009-08-27 Moved bank headquarters from Pensacola, Florida to Atlanta, Georgia.
Total assets: $257,309,000
Total deposits: $190,600,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $190,600,000
Equity capital: $53,553,000
Net income: $4,156,000
Return on Assets: 3.26
Return on Equity: 16.22
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Royal Bank Of Canada
No associations
LandOfFree
RBC Bank, (Georgia) National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with RBC Bank, (Georgia) National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and RBC Bank, (Georgia) National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18719