Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
58315
2006
FDIC Certificate Number: 58315
FDIC's unique number: 446052
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3441426
Report Date: 2009-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-12-22
2006-11-13 Institution established. Original name: Rockbridge Commercial Bank.
2009-12-18 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
2009-12-18 FDIC closing information for
Rockbridge Commercial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/rockbridge.html.
Total assets: $294,024,000
Total deposits: $291,707,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
RockBridge Commercial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with RockBridge Commercial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and RockBridge Commercial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5501