Connecticut – Tolland – Vernon Rockville
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
www.rockvillebank.com
Connecticut
Tolland
Vernon Rockville
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
18203
1858
FDIC Certificate Number: 18203
FDIC's unique number: 12123
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 633501
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 22
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1858-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Savings Bank Of Rockville.
1988-04-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1997-11-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2000-12-01 Moved bank headquarters from Rockville, Connecticut to Vernon Rockville, Connecticut.
2000-12-01 Changed name to Rockville Bank .
Total assets: $1,743,117,000
Total deposits: $1,367,239,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,367,239,000
Equity capital: $237,864,000
Net income: $2,641,000
Return on Assets: 0.3
Return on Equity: 2.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Rockville Financial, Inc.
Rockville Bank - Big Y Supermarket Br
Rockville Bank - Big Y Supermarket Branch
Rockville Bank - Big Y Supermarket Prospect Hill Road
Rockville Bank - Colchester Branch
Rockville Bank - Coventry Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Rockville Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Rockville Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rockville Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26795