Oklahoma – Canadian – Piedmont
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Oklahoma
Canadian
Piedmont
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
22239
1976
FDIC Certificate Number: 22239
FDIC's unique number: 15455
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 701558
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1976-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Rolling Hills State Bank.
1989-01-12 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Farmers & Merchants Bank of Piedmont in Piedmont, Oklahoma.
1998-08-10 Changed name to F&m; Bank, National Association .
1998-08-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1998-08-10 Reorganized.
1999-07-08 Changed name to F & M Bank, National Association, Oklahoma City, Oklahoma .
2011-10-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers & Merchants Bank in Edmond, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $13,212,000
Total deposits: $13,099,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Rolling Hills State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Rolling Hills State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rolling Hills State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18352