Wisconsin – Crawford – Gays Mills
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Crawford
Gays Mills
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10740
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 10740
FDIC's unique number: 6891
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Madison
Federal Reserve ID Number: 849544
Report Date: 1998-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1998-08-21
1904-09-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Gays Mills.
1972-01-01 Changed name to Bank Of Gays Mills .
1990-01-16 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1990-07-03 Changed name to Liberty Bank & Trust .
1991-09-27 Changed name to Royal Bank - Gays Mills .
1992-08-24 Changed name to Royal Bank .
1992-08-26 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1998-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Royal Bank in Elroy, Wisconsin.
2011-02-11 Acquired Badger State Bank in Cassville, Wisconsin as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $12,787,000
Total deposits: $11,458,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Royal Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Royal Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Royal Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14244