Minnesota – Isanti – Braham
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Isanti
Braham
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
5099
1899
FDIC Certificate Number: 5099
FDIC's unique number: 3408
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 103554
Report Date: 2010-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-30
1899-08-29 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank Of Braham.
1989-04-01 Changed name to Rural American Bank - Braham .
2007-11-03 Acquired The First National Bank Of Pine City in Pine City, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Frandsen Bank & Trust in Lonsdale, Minnesota.
2011-08-22 Acquired Queen City Federal Savings Bank in Virginia, Minnesota.
Total assets: $108,994,000
Total deposits: $93,005,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Rural American Bank - Braham does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Rural American Bank - Braham, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rural American Bank - Braham will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13479