Minnesota – Benton – Foley
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.foleybank.com
Minnesota
Benton
Foley
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10209
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 10209
FDIC's unique number: 6548
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 974259
Report Date: 2005-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2006-03-16
1903-05-03 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Foley.
1993-07-01 Acquired First State Bank Of Gilman, Incorporated in Gilman, Minnesota.
1993-07-01 Changed name to Rural American Bank-foley/gilman .
2003-02-01 Changed name to Rural American Bank - Foley .
2006-03-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Frandsen Bank & Trust in Lonsdale, Minnesota.
2008-08-18 Acquired First National Bank Of Montgomery in Montgomery, Minnesota.
2009-10-19 Acquired Community Bank Of The Red River Valley in East Grand Forks, Minnesota.
2009-10-19 Acquired Northern National Bank in Nisswa, Minnesota.
2010-05-17 Acquired Valley Bank in Waterville, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Braham in Braham, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Luck in Luck, Wisconsin.
2011-08-22 Acquired Queen City Federal Savings Bank in Virginia, Minnesota.
Total assets: $72,832,000
Total deposits: $65,442,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Rural American Bank - Foley does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Rural American Bank - Foley, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rural American Bank - Foley will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1933