Minnesota – Mille Lacs – Isle
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Mille Lacs
Isle
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10205
1930
FDIC Certificate Number: 10205
FDIC's unique number: 6544
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 908151
Report Date: 1991-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-01-31
1930-04-15 Institution established. Original name: Lakeside State Bank.
1989-04-01 Changed name to Rural American Bank - Isle .
1992-01-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Milaca in Milaca, Minnesota.
2006-05-04 Moved bank headquarters from Isle, Minnesota to Milaca, Minnesota.
Total assets: $16,765,000
Total deposits: $15,308,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Rural American Bank - Isle does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Rural American Bank - Isle, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rural American Bank - Isle will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1927