Colorado – Boulder – Boulder
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Boulder
Boulder
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18512
1924
FDIC Certificate Number: 18512
FDIC's unique number: 12404
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 766454
Report Date: 1988-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1924-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Security Bank Of Boulder.
1988-06-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Affiliated National Bank - Boulder in Boulder, Colorado.
1991-09-03 Changed name to Affiliated National Bank - Boulder .
1992-01-23 Acquired Affiliated National Bank - Louisville in Louisville, Colorado.
1992-01-23 Acquired Affiliated National Bank - Lafayette in Lafayette, Colorado.
1992-01-23 Acquired Affiliated National Bank - Arapahoe in Boulder, Colorado.
1992-12-01 Changed name to Bank One, Boulder, National Association .
1995-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $14,137,000
Total deposits: $13,760,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Security Bank of Boulder does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Security Bank of Boulder, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security Bank of Boulder will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25104