Georgia – Houston – Perry
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Houston
Perry
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
27048
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 27048
FDIC's unique number: 38560
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 708137
Report Date: 2009-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-07-27
1987-09-14 Institution established. Original name: Crossroads Bank Of Georgia.
1992-03-13 Acquired Guaranty Federal Savings Association in Warner Robins, Georgia.
1992-08-18 Reorganized.
1999-06-03 Changed name to Security Bank Of Houston County .
2009-07-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of State Bank and Trust Company in Macon, Georgia.
2009-07-24 FDIC closing information for
Security Bank Of Houston County : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/sb-houston.html.
2009-08-19 Moved bank headquarters from Perry, Georgia to Macon, Georgia.
2009-12-04 Acquired First Security National Bank in Norcross, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-12-04 Acquired The Buckhead Community Bank in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-07-30 Acquired Northwest Bank & Trust in Acworth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-12-17 Acquired United Americas Bank, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-10-14 Acquired Piedmont Community Bank in Gray, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-10-21 Acquired Community Capital Bank in Jonesboro, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $371,624,000
Total deposits: $313,155,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Security Bank of Houston County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Security Bank of Houston County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security Bank of Houston County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14706