Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29162
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29162
FDIC's unique number: 41996
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 642679
Report Date: 1998-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-11-05
1934-09-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1988-03-31 Changed name to Financial Federal Savings Bank .
1988-03-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1992-10-27 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-07-10 Changed name to Security First Network Bank, F.S.B. .
1996-05-13 Changed name to Security First Network Bank .
1996-11-20 Moved bank headquarters from Pineville, Kentucky to Atlanta, Georgia.
1998-09-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $82,035,000
Total deposits: $57,562,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Security First Network Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Security First Network Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security First Network Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27471