Texas – Harrison – Elysian Fields
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Harrison
Elysian Fields
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19936
1913
FDIC Certificate Number: 19936
FDIC's unique number: 13696
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 372350
Report Date: 1992-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-04-19
1913-05-20 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Security State Bank.
1969-04-11 Changed primary regulatory agency from State to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1969-04-11 Became FDIC insured.
1993-03-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First State Bank in Gladewater, Texas.
1995-01-01 Acquired Lindale National Bank in Lindale, Texas.
1995-08-14 Changed name to First Service Bank .
1996-12-14 Acquired First Heritage Bank, National Association in Pittsburg, Texas.
1997-04-18 Moved bank headquarters from Gladewater, Texas to Marshall, Texas.
1999-03-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hibernia National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $13,671,000
Total deposits: $12,895,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Security State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Security State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2895