Montana – Sheridan – Plentywood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Montana
Sheridan
Plentywood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11019
1912
FDIC Certificate Number: 11019
FDIC's unique number: 7063
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 653956
Report Date: 1996-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-06-27
1912-09-01 Institution established. Original name: Security State Bank, Plentywood, Montana.
1996-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Rocky Mountain Bank in Billings, Montana.
2005-01-07 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-06-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $66,900,000
Total deposits: $58,293,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Security State Bank, Plentywood, Montana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Security State Bank, Plentywood, Montana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security State Bank, Plentywood, Montana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20717