Pennsylvania – Bucks – Perkasie
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Pennsylvania
Bucks
Perkasie
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30116
1897
FDIC Certificate Number: 30116
FDIC's unique number: 42950
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 667373
Report Date: 1991-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1992-06-02
1897-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Sellersville Savings And Loan Association.
1987-04-30 Moved bank headquarters from Sellersville, Pennsylvania to Perkasie, Pennsylvania.
1987-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1992-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National Bank of Boyertown in Boyertown, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-01 Changed name to National Penn Bank .
1993-12-02 Acquired Chestnut Hill National Bank in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1999-01-04 Acquired The Elverson National Bank in Elverson, Pennsylvania.
2001-01-04 Acquired Bernville Bank, National Association in Bernville, Pennsylvania.
2003-02-25 Acquired Firstservice Bank in Doylestown, Pennsylvania.
2003-12-15 Acquired Hometowne Heritage Bank in Intercourse, Pennsylvania.
2004-06-11 Acquired The People's Bank Of Oxford in Oxford, Pennsylvania.
2006-03-27 Acquired Nittany Bank in State College, Pennsylvania.
2008-02-02 Acquired Keystone Nazareth Bank & Trust Company in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $145,332,000
Total deposits: $98,079,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Sellersville Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Sellersville Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sellersville Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9881