Oklahoma – Coal – Coalgate
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.shamrockbank.com
Oklahoma
Coal
Coalgate
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4236
1924
FDIC Certificate Number: 4236
FDIC's unique number: 2780
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 300353
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 12529
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1924-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Coalgate.
2002-02-01 Changed name to Shamrock Bank, N.A. .
2002-03-22 Acquired Shamrock Bank, National Association in Mountain View, Oklahoma.
2002-08-09 Acquired Bryan County National Bank in Caddo, Oklahoma.
2002-09-06 Acquired Clayton State Bank in Clayton, Oklahoma.
2002-09-06 Acquired First Bank Of Apache in Apache, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $251,673,000
Total deposits: $220,808,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $220,808,000
Equity capital: $29,739,000
Net income: $1,929,000
Return on Assets: 1.55
Return on Equity: 13.72
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Shamrock Bancshares Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Shamrock Bank, N.A. - Altus Branch
Shamrock Bank, N.A. - Bryan County National Bank Branch
Shamrock Bank, N.A. - Clayton State Bank Branch
Shamrock Bank, N.A. - Durant Branch
Shamrock Bank, N.A. - First Bank Of Apache Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Shamrock Bank, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Shamrock Bank, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Shamrock Bank, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14864