New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
33509
1991
FDIC Certificate Number: 33509
FDIC's unique number: 47257
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1897579
Report Date: 1995-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1996-02-07
1991-10-10 Institution established. Original name: New Dartmouth Bank.
1991-10-10 Acquired Numerica Savings Bank, Fsb in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Dartmouth Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired New Hampshire Savings Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1992-06-26 Acquired The Somersworth Bank in Somersworth, New Hampshire.
1994-06-06 Reorganized.
1994-06-06 Changed name to Shawmut Bank Nh .
1995-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet Bank-NH in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1996-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Manchester, New Hampshire to Nashua, New Hampshire.
1997-05-23 Moved bank headquarters from Nashua, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $1,343,907,000
Total deposits: $1,194,366,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Shawmut Bank NH does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Shawmut Bank NH, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Shawmut Bank NH will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20645