Colorado – Denver – Denver
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Colorado
Denver
Denver
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31906
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 31906
FDIC's unique number: 44740
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 853279
Report Date: 1985-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10
1977-12-13 Institution established. Original name: Sierra Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1986-02-28 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $42,564,000
Total deposits: $86,583,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Sierra Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Sierra Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sierra Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6952