Kentucky – Pulaski – Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kentucky
Pulaski
Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
34528
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34528
FDIC's unique number: 59035
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2598275
Report Date: 2007-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23358
The date of the last data update: 2008-01-08
1997-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Somerset National Bank.
2004-04-16 Acquired Mccreary National Bank in Whitley City, Kentucky.
2007-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FORCHT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION in Lexington, Kentucky.
Total assets: $179,677,000
Total deposits: $159,620,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Somerset National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Somerset National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Somerset National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24360